judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLAIR VS. STATE, DMV

Case Information: 33375
Short Caption:BLAIR VS. STATE, DMVCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388157Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/25/1998 / Hale, FloydSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00126
11/25/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Floyd A. Hale. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/01/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/01/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/11/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John G. Watkins--check no. 8626.
12/11/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 11/23/98. 98-00347
12/11/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Transcript Certification. 98-00348
12/11/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00349
12/18/1998MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 98-00431
01/04/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. 99-00024
01/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-00121
01/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended 99-00399
02/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The state has moved to dismiss this appeal as oot since appellant's license revocation period has ended. Appellant opposes the motion. Because appellant provides no reasons for revisiting our decision, or deciding the issue differently, we decline to do so. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-00887
02/19/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Stay of Remittitur. 99-01148
03/10/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Remittitur. Remittitur stayed until: 30 days from the date of this order. If prior to the expiration of that thirty-day period, the clerk of this court receives notice from the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition, this stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceeding. Otherwise, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur forthwith. 99-01664
04/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. Petition for Writ of Certiorari was filed in April 1, 1999 and placed on the docket April 19, 1999, as no. 98-1679. (No action required.) 99-03220
06/21/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. 99-05351
08/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order to Issue Remittitur. The Supreme Court of the United States denied appellant's petition on June 14, 1999. We direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur in this matter, forthwith. 99-07098
08/03/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-07140
08/03/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/18/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 1999. 99-07140