judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEDIST HIRPASSA V. DC METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT

Case Information: 10-CV-1097
Short Caption:KEDIST HIRPASSA V. DC METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENTClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7509-09Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKedist Hirpassa YPro SeN
AppelleeD.C. Metropolitan Police DepartmentN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS frmo the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
09/14/2010TMC - OTSC - RESPONSES
09/27/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct name
10/13/2010 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. (RDPRTE) (jl)
10/13/2010DISMISSED
11/04/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived