judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EUGENE R. BRUMBAUGH and ELIZABETH D. BRUMBAUGH, husband and wife v. MIKELSON LAND COMPANY, a Montana Corporation

Case Heading (S-07-0218)
Case Number:S-07-0218Case Docketed On:09/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:EUGENE R. BRUMBAUGH and ELIZABETH D. BRUMBAUGH, husband and wife v. MIKELSON LAND COMPANY, a Montana Corporation
Full Title:EUGENE R. BRUMBAUGH and ELIZABETH D. BRUMBAUGH, husband and wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. MIKELSON LAND COMPANY, a Montana Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEugene R. BrumbaughStephen Joseph Darrah
AppellantElizabeth D. BrumbaughStephen Joseph Darrah
AppelleeMikelson Land Company, a Montana CorporationThomas Patrick Keegan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Easements, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 66
Citation:185 P.3d 695 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/17/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/25/2007Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/11/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - request for submission of case to expedited docketNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/10/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/10/2008Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Keegan for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - S. Joseph Darrah for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/04/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stephen Joseph Darrah for appellants; Thomas Patrick Keegan for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/12/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/07/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by Joyce Boyer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal