Case Information: 50821 | |||
Short Caption: | HALVERSEN (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52000 , 54992 , 58945 , 62873 , 68335 , 68335-COA , 72333 , 72333-COA , 74978 , 74978-COA , 76176 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C231500 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/02/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/02/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 08-00126 | |
02/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Fast Track Statement and Appendix (or show cause) due: 10 days. | 08-05121 | |
03/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Attorney Kenneth Frizzell. | 08-05777 | |
03/07/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (Attorney Kenneth Frizzell). | 08-05779 | |
03/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Certificate of Mailing - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. | 08-06429 | |
03/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. Attorney Kenneth G. Frizzell's motion to withdraw from representation is denied. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 45 days. | 08-06686 | |
03/26/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 3/18/08. Address updated per NDOC 3/26/08. Remailed to new address. | 08-07405 | |
05/05/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-11159 | |
05/05/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-11160 | |
05/29/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-13553 | |
05/29/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-13554 | |
01/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-01695 | |
02/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-02111 | |
02/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2009. | 09-02111 |