judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL PATTERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0005)
Case Number:S-07-0005Case Docketed On:01/05/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL PATTERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL PATTERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appelle (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMICHAEL PATTERSONDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
William Elliott
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2008 WY 33
Citation:179 P. 3d 863

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/05/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/22/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/06/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/24/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
05/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for William Elliott to appear on behalf of appellant (faxed)Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for William Elliott to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions and verdict; Volumes III-IV, transcripts; Volume V, exhibits; Volume VI, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Leda Pojman on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Elliott for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/19/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, Defender Aid Program, and William Elliott, argument by Mr. Elliott for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/27/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/14/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/14/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/16/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal