judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WARREN R. JEFFERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0103
Short Caption:WARREN R. JEFFERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6351-78Filed Date:01/09/1980

Opening Event Date:01/09/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/06/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/29/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWarren R. Jefferson N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JEFFERSON, WARREN R. UNITED STATES
01/09/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/06/1981FiledRecord Completed
07/29/1982FiledBriefing Completed
10/12/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/07/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition