judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-154
B-154
03/09/1967
Application for Writ of Error
MCKINLEY J. RICHARDS
CONSOLIDATED UNDERWRITERS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/25/1967Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
03/30/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
03/09/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/25/1967Supplement to Petition filed
04/20/1967Motion for Extension of Time filedDenied
04/10/1967m/l/f to supp app writ errorFiling granted
03/30/1967Response to Petition
03/09/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/09/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McKinley J. RichardsPetitioner
Consolidated Underwriters, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information