judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-131
B-131
02/27/1967
Application for Writ of Error
EUGENE SWIERE
HARMS MARINE SERVICE, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/20/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/14/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/27/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/1967Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
04/27/1967Response to Motion filed
04/20/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/14/1967Response to Petition
02/27/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/27/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eugene SwierePetitioner
Harms Marine Service, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information