judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-137
B-137
02/28/1967
Application for Writ of Error
RICHARD W. GORSALITZ, ET UX.
DR. G. G. HARRIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/27/1967Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/14/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/30/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/14/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/28/1967Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
02/28/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/27/1967Supplemental Brief filed
06/14/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/30/1967Reply to Response
03/14/1967Response to Petition
02/28/1967Supplement to Petition filed
02/28/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/28/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. G. G. HarrisRespondent
Richard W. Gorsalitz, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information