judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-128
B-128
02/27/1967
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF SAFETY
ODIE LAVOY MORRIS AND JOHN SMITH CASSELMAN, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1967Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/07/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/27/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1967Opinion issued
05/10/1967Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1967Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1967Document received (See Remarks)
03/17/1967Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/07/1967Response to Petition
02/27/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/27/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Odie Lavoy Morris and John Smith Casselman, Jr.Respondent
Henry Wade, District Attorney of Dallas County, TexasAmicus Curiae
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF SAFETYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information