Case: 11-21-00022-CV
11-21-00022-CV
02/22/2021
Divorce
Christopher Perricone
Katie Beth Perricone
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/2021 | Case stored | | |||||||
04/09/2021 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
03/18/2021 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
03/18/2021 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
03/17/2021 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/10/2021 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
03/10/2021 | Fee paid | | |||||||
03/10/2021 | Telephone call received | | |||||||
03/02/2021 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||||
02/22/2021 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
02/22/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
02/22/2021 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
12/24/2020 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
11/30/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/02/2021 | Status | Mandate to Issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Perricone, Christopher | Appellant | Lance H. "Luke" Beshara Milo Bobbitt |
Perricone, Katie Beth | Appellee | Laura S. Hayes |
Trial Court Information
County Court
Palo Pinto
Honorable Mike Moore, Judge
C49295
Elizabeth Bourquin, Court Reporter