judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-144
B-144
03/07/1967
Application for Writ of Error
CERTAIN-TEED PRODUCTS CORPORATION
ALLEN L. BELL AND WIFE, GLADYS BELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
03/07/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1968Opinion issued
05/18/1967Letter Filed
04/19/1967Document received (See Remarks)
04/19/1967Document received (See Remarks)
03/17/1967Response to Petition
03/07/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/07/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Certain-Teed Products CorporationPetitioner
Allen L. Bell and wife, Gladys BellRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information