Case: 08-93-00303-CR
08-93-00303-CR
08/24/1993
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Hayes, Edwin Shurrod
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
08/24/1993
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/25/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/25/1994 | Shuck purged | | |
07/25/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/12/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/12/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/29/1994 | Submitted | | |
04/29/1994 | Submission | | |
04/29/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/03/1994 | Submission | | |
02/02/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
02/02/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/02/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/02/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/20/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/07/1994 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
12/15/1993 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/15/1993 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
12/13/1993 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
12/09/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
12/03/1993 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
11/19/1993 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
11/12/1993 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
10/29/1993 | Transcript Filed | | |
08/24/1993 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
08/24/1993 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
08/11/1993 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/25/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HAYES, EDWIN SHURROD | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Mark Fernandez |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
643934
36 yrs. TDC