Case Information: 92-CF-1313 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL FIKES V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F12445-90 | Filed Date: | 10/09/1992 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/09/1992 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/16/1993 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/18/1994 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/24/1994 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/07/1994 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Michael Fikes | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
10/09/1992 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
11/09/1992 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Michael J. Dennis, Esq. | |||
11/16/1992 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT | |||
12/07/1992 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
01/12/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (287 pgs/Sargent-Burns) 7/20-22/92 | |||
02/05/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (282 pgs. -- R. Jones) (7/15-16/92 proceedings). | |||
03/16/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (191-pgs/hilton 7/17/92 proc.) | |||
03/16/1993 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
04/15/1993 | ORDER: The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any requests for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By WHN) | |||
05/04/1993 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF pending completion of rt's | |||
06/16/1993 | ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFto the extent that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court with specificity of what transcript is still outstanding and of all actions he has taken, including those taken since the date he filed his motion for extension of time, to assure the transmittal of that transcript to this court. (By WHN) | |||
06/24/1993 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to court ord dtd 6/16/93 | |||
07/15/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (162-pgs/3/12/92 wray proc.) | |||
10/06/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (14 pages--Franklin) (9/10/92 proceedings) | |||
11/29/1993 | ORDER that the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. Any request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (by: WHN) | |||
01/26/1994 | ORDER that counsel for appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (by: WHN) | |||
02/10/1994 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until 3/14/94. | |||
03/31/1994 | ORD DENY APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and counsel for appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (By JMF) | |||
04/14/1994 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF. | |||
04/14/1994 | RECEIVED - BRIEF OF APPELLANT. | |||
05/05/1994 | ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before May 18, 1994. (by:WHN) | |||
05/18/1994 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/18/1994 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/06/1994 | FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR | |||
10/24/1994 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/24/1994 | ARGUED (WG,KG,GA) Michael J. Dennis, Esquire, for appellant. Robert T. Swanson, Esquire, for apellee. | |||
11/15/1994 | AFFIRMED MOJ (WG,KG,GA) | |||
12/07/1994 | MANDATE ISSUED |