judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-274
B-274
05/19/1967
Application for Writ of Error
ANNIE B. SEMMONS
AMERICAN SURETY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/09/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/09/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/11/1967Response to Motion filed
08/09/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/09/1967Response to Petition
05/24/1967Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
05/19/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/19/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Surety CompanyRespondent
Annie B. SemmonsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information