judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-267
B-267
05/10/1967
Application for Writ of Error
CLEO C. GRACEY
ARLINE B. WEST, INDIVIDUALLY, ETC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/26/1968Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/29/1967Post submission brief filedRespondent
06/02/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/22/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/30/1968Motion to dismissOverruled
01/26/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/10/1968Opinion issued
09/29/1967Post submission brief filed
06/14/1967Document received (See Remarks)
06/14/1967Document received (See Remarks)
06/02/1967Reply to Response
05/22/1967Response to Petition
05/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/10/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Arline B. West, individually, etc.Respondent
Cleo C. GraceyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information