Case: 01-20-00137-CR
01-20-00137-CR
02/11/2020
Sex Offenses
Kenneth Nester
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/08/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
05/06/2020 | Record due | | |||||
04/30/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
04/30/2020 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
04/30/2020 | Motion to dismiss disposed | | |||||
04/29/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
04/22/2020 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
04/07/2020 | Order entered | Strike document filed in this Court |
| ||||
04/07/2020 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Strike document filed in this Court | | ||||
04/01/2020 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
04/01/2020 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
02/28/2020 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
02/12/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
02/11/2020 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
02/11/2020 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
02/04/2020 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
01/30/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/07/2020 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/08/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/08/2045 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Daniel C. McCrory The Honorable Kim K Ogg |
Nester, Kenneth | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Sirianni Jr. |
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 248th District Court
1578859
8 YEARS TDCJ-ID