judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-9674
B-9674
08/01/1980
Direct Appeal
RENEE MARTINEZ
EDUARDO R. RODRIGUEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/08/1980Response to Brief filed
09/26/1980Appellees' Brief filed
08/29/1980Direct Appeal filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1980Opinion issued
10/08/1980Response to Brief filed
09/26/1980Appellees' Brief filed
09/22/1980Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
08/29/1980Direct Appeal filed
08/01/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eduardo R. RodriguezAppellee
Renee MartinezAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information