judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSON (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38196
Short Caption:ANDERSON (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3593Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12318
08/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/26/00 and 12/27/00. Court Reporter: Sheldon L. Hensley. 01-14378
09/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 01-16182
10/05/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Request for Rough Draft Transcript. 01-16788
10/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 26 and 27, 2000. Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. Filed in district court on: August 3, 2001. 01-16795
10/08/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16846
10/08/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16847
10/30/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: November 5, 2001. 01-18158
11/06/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18555
12/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having concluded that appellant's contentions lack merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21066
01/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00318
01/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 14, 2002. 02-00318