Case: 05-94-00087-CR
05-94-00087-CR
01/20/1994
Theft
Buchanan, David Laird
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/13/1996 | Case stored | | |
02/13/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/13/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/23/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
01/17/1996 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
01/16/1996 | Motion to Abate Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/16/1996 | Motion to Abate Filed | | |
12/22/1995 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
11/22/1995 | Mandate issued | | |
10/25/1995 | Opinion issued | | |
03/28/1995 | Case stored | | |
03/28/1995 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
03/28/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/27/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/27/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/25/1995 | Submission | | |
01/25/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/25/1995 | Submission | | |
01/25/1995 | Submitted | | |
12/19/1994 | MattConv | | |
09/16/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
09/16/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/16/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/25/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/22/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
08/16/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
08/16/1994 | MattConv | | |
08/16/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
08/12/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/27/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
07/19/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/14/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
04/26/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/19/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
04/07/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
01/25/1994 | Notice Sent | | |
01/20/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/11/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/20/1993 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/13/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Buchanan, David Laird | Criminal - Appellant | David Laird Buchanan |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F90-34851-QJ
25 yrs TDC