judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARPENTER (ERNEST) VS. STATE

Case Information: 54542
Short Caption:CARPENTER (ERNEST) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49319 , 65066 , 76587 , 76587-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR062688Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/08/2010How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-22263
09/14/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. 09-22992
12/16/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 1. 09-30499
12/16/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 2. 09-30501
12/16/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 3. (SEALED) This volume is not available to view electronically. 09-30502
12/16/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 4. (SEALED) This volume is not available to view electronically. 09-30503
12/16/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 5. 09-30504
12/16/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 6. 09-30505
12/16/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. Fn2[This court denies the motion for appointment of counsel as moot.] 10-03871
03/08/2010Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. 10-06052
03/09/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Glynn Cartledge is appointed as counsel for appellant. Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 10-06116
03/24/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-07695
03/24/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/06/09. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. 10-07722
03/24/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/10/07 and 03/16/07. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. 10-07723
06/04/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-14488
06/04/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: July 7, 2010. 10-14489
06/09/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/16/07. 10-14913
06/10/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lesley Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/10/07. 10-15104
07/08/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-17681
07/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 7, 2010. 10-17823
08/09/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-20472
08/16/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 8, 2010. 10-21104
09/08/2010BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. 10-22976
09/08/2010AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix. 10-22977
10/08/2010BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. 10-26444
10/08/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - State's Supplemental Appendix. 10-26445
10/12/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Presentence Report. 10-26732
11/05/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Presentence Investigaion Report due: 15 days. 10-28953
11/08/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-29202
11/08/2010Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
03/17/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 11-08253
04/12/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-10778
04/12/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/19/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 14, 2011. 11-10778
09/12/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We direct the clerk of this court to file the motions received on February 24, 2012, and July 26, 2012. 12-28777
09/12/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Recall Remittitur and Other Relief. 12-05964
09/12/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Re-Open Appeal and for Status Check. 12-23641