Case Information: 33370 | |||
Short Caption: | SARDINA VS. SARDINA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D210107 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/25/1998 / Pomrenze, Sandra | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/19/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Chad M. Golightly, Ltd.--check no. 6531 | ||
11/19/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00120 | |
11/25/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Sandra L. Pomrenze. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/01/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/11/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 11/20/98. | 98-00340 | |
01/07/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. The conference is scheduled for January 28, 1999. | 99-00085 | |
01/19/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. | 99-00330 | |
01/21/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-00424 | |
02/08/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-00868 | |
02/19/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended | 99-01119 | |
03/15/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule and the preparation of transcripts shall remain suspended. | 99-01818 | |
04/19/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Recent Jurisdictional Challenge and Issues, Mootness of Issues, and Insufficient Funds to Continue Appeal. | 99-03032 | |
05/04/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. On April 19, 1999, appellant filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. We grant appellant's motion. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML | 99-03532 | |
05/04/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |