judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BENJAMIN CALHOON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,

Case Heading (S-07-0213)
Case Number:S-07-0213Case Docketed On:09/13/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:BENJAMIN CALHOON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,
Full Title:BENJAMIN CALHOON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBenjamin CalhoonRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Michael Thomas Kahler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/13/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/13/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/16/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary. Motion to dismiss and motion for sanctions; and received proposed order.MotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/06/2007Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
11/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal