judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. D. ROBINSON, ET AL. v. WILLIAM BLAIR, ET AL., HON. P. R. PRICE, CHIEF JUSTICE, ET AL.

Case: A-254
A-254
07/08/1944
MISC PETITION
W. D. ROBINSON, ET AL.
WILLIAM BLAIR, ET AL., HON. P. R. PRICE, CHIEF JUSTICE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/1944Reply to ResponseRelator
09/05/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
08/24/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
08/23/1944Errata FiledRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/09/1944Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
09/15/1944Reply to Response
09/11/1944Response to Motion filed
09/05/1944Brief in Support of Petition
08/24/1944Document filed (see remarks)
08/24/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/23/1944Errata Filed
07/08/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. D. Robinson, et al.Relator
William Blair, et al.Respondent
Hon. P. R. Price, Chief Justice, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information