judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-9654
B-9654
08/01/1980
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
JAMES A. MCDONALD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/24/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/15/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
08/01/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/31/1980Response to Motion filed
10/24/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/18/1980Document received (See Remarks)
08/15/1980Response to Petition
08/01/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James A. McDonaldRespondent
City of HoustonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information