Case: 12-20-00035-CR
12-20-00035-CR
02/07/2020
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Charles D. Dearing, Jr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/04/2020 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||
04/27/2020 | Case stored | | |||||
04/27/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
03/30/2020 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
03/16/2020 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
02/28/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||
02/21/2020 | Response filed |
| |||||
02/21/2020 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
02/20/2020 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||
02/07/2020 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed | | |||||
02/07/2020 | Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect |
| |||||
02/07/2020 | Court packet sent to parties |
| |||||
02/07/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
02/07/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/27/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
04/27/2045 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. W. Stephen Shires |
Dearing, Jr., Charles D. | Criminal - Appellant | Charles D. Dearing Jr. |
Trial Court Information
123rd District Court
Shelby
Honorable Leann Kay Rafferty
19CV35065
Terri Hudson