judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00484-CR
02-96-00484-CR
10/21/1996
Theft
Ford, Ben McCarver
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
10/21/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/1999Other Document Received
10/28/1997Mandate Issued
10/01/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
06/18/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
05/15/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/14/1997Submitted
05/14/1997Submission
12/16/1996Case ready to be set
11/07/1996Submission
10/21/1996Case ready to be set
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
02/12/1996No Description Available.
02/09/1996Case ready to be set
01/18/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/02/1996No Description Available.
12/29/1995Appellant's brief due
12/04/1995No Description Available.
11/22/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1995No Description Available.
11/15/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/09/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/31/1995No Description Available.
10/19/1995Order Entered
09/13/1995No Description Available.
09/11/1995Appellant's brief due
07/27/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/20/1995Order Entered
06/01/1995No Description Available.
05/14/1995Appellant's brief due
03/09/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/10/1995No Description Available.
12/22/1994Record due
12/15/1994No Description Available.
12/15/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1994No Description Available.
12/07/1994No Description Available.
11/28/1994No Description Available.
11/03/1994Record due
09/22/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/20/1994No Description Available.
07/28/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/19/1994No Description Available.
07/15/1994No Description Available.
05/18/1994No Description Available.
05/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/28/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasErnest Davila
Ford, Ben MccarverCriminal - AppellantHenry L. Burkholder, Iii
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable R. E. Thornton
621522
30 yrs. TDC