judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0210)
Case Number:S-07-0210Case Docketed On:09/11/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKent Alan Proffit Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other, Venue
Opinion Number:2008 WY 102
Citation:191 P.3d 963

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/11/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief for appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/28/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/28/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/01/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seventeen volumes. Volumes I-VII, original papers; volume VIII, confidential folder; Volumes IX-XIII, transcripts; Volumes XIV-XVII, jury questionnaires.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant; Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented - Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/29/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/16/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/16/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards (3). Record, three boxes, signed for by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court Petition for Writ of Certiorari filedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
01/30/2009Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court peitition for writ of certiorari is deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal