Case Information: 38194 | |||
Short Caption: | PARKS (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33605 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140785 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/03/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/18/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/18/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-12253 | |
08/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 01-13686 | |
12/03/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 01-20180 | |
12/03/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/27/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. The record presently before this court does not contain a transcript of the evidentiary hearing conducted below on June 8, 2001. If the transcript of that hearing has already been prepared, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has not been prepared, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. The clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date the completed transcript is filed in the district court to transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. | 04-01682 | |
02/11/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: June 8, 2001. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook (filed in response to this court's order of 1/27/04). | 04-02732 | |
02/23/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: June 8, 2001. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 04-03467 | |
05/05/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that appellant has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-08208 | |
06/02/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-08349 | |
06/02/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/16/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2004. | 04-08349 |