judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00455-CR
02-96-00455-CR
10/21/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Gonzalez, Ernesto
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1997Mandate Issued
06/26/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/13/1997Submitted
05/13/1997Submission
05/06/1997Letter
05/02/1997Letter
04/30/1997Other Document Filed
04/21/1997Brief Filed
04/21/1997Case ready to be set
02/20/1997Submission
02/18/1997Brief Filed
12/20/1996No Description Available.
12/03/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/26/1996No Description Available.
10/24/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/23/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
10/21/1996Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
10/21/1996Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
10/21/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Gonzalez, ErnestoCriminal - AppellantGary L. Medlin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Sharen Wilson
0573934D
CT2: 10 yrs IDTDCJ