judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00479-CR
02-96-00479-CR
10/21/1996
Other Felony
Busler, Chris Eugene
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
10/21/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/06/1998Mandate Issued
07/08/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
04/08/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
03/10/1998Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/16/1996Submitted
12/16/1996Submission
11/07/1996Submission
10/21/1996Case ready to be set
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
05/09/1996No Description Available.
04/29/1996No Description Available.
03/25/1996Case ready to be set
03/25/1996No Description Available.
03/25/1996No Description Available.
03/21/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/11/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/11/1996No Description Available.
02/15/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/08/1996No Description Available.
01/11/1996Appellant's brief due
01/11/1996No Description Available.
12/14/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedOverruled
12/14/1995Order Entered
12/07/1995Appellant's brief due
12/07/1995No Description Available.
12/05/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/26/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1995Appellant's brief due
10/23/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/19/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/21/1995Appellant's brief due
09/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/07/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1995Appellant's brief due
08/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/27/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/20/1995No Description Available.
07/19/1995Appellant's brief due
06/20/1995No Description Available.
06/19/1995No Description Available.
05/22/1995No Description Available.
04/27/1995No Description Available.Item is Moot
04/21/1995No Description Available.
04/13/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/30/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/24/1995No Description Available.
03/23/1995No Description Available.
03/22/1995No Description Available.
03/20/1995Record due
01/24/1995No Description Available.
01/19/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/11/1995No Description Available.
01/10/1995No Description Available.
01/10/1995Record due
11/17/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/14/1994No Description Available.
11/09/1994Record due
09/29/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/20/1994No Description Available.
09/13/1994No Description Available.
09/07/1994No Description Available.
06/10/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
05/12/1994No Description Available.
05/12/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable John Robert McCoy
94-09004
10 yrs. TDC & $10,000 fine