judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00473-CR
02-96-00473-CR
10/21/1996
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Ponce, James
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
10/21/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/07/1998Mandate Issued
11/19/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
07/23/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
06/19/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/18/1997Submitted
06/18/1997Submission
12/16/1996Case ready to be set
11/07/1996Submission
10/21/1996Case ready to be set
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
06/27/1996Case ready to be set
06/27/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
06/20/1996No brief received
06/11/1996No Description Available.
05/14/1996Appellant's brief due
04/25/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/16/1996No Description Available.
04/15/1996Appellant's brief due
03/28/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/01/1996No Description Available.
02/29/1996Appellant's brief due
01/30/1996No Description Available.
01/30/1996No Description Available.
11/02/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/30/1995No Description Available.
10/25/1995No Description Available.
10/05/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/06/1995No Description Available.
07/27/1995Order Entered
03/31/1995No Description Available.
01/19/1995Order Entered
01/11/1995No Description Available.
11/08/1994No Description Available.
05/10/1994No Description Available.
05/06/1994No Description Available.
03/09/1994No Description Available.
03/09/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/07/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Ponce, JamesCriminal - AppellantJames M. Sims
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel
664392
35 yrs. TDC & $85,000 fine