Case: 05-21-00243-CV
05-21-00243-CV
04/14/2021
Real Property
Colleen Marie Fisher
Paul M. Cooke, Sr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/21/2021 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
04/15/2021 | Fee requested |
| |||||
04/15/2021 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
04/14/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
04/05/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/25/2021 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||
01/05/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/25/2021 | Status | Fee due in this court |
05/05/2021 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Fisher, Colleen Marie | Appellant | Susan Elizabeth Wright |
Cooke, Sr., Paul M. | Appellee | W. Ashton Randall III |
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gena Slaughter
DC-18-05882
Melba Wright