judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00458-CR
02-96-00458-CR
10/21/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lockett, Anthony Troy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1998Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/05/1998Mandate Issued
04/29/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
01/14/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
12/18/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/31/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/16/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/07/1997Submitted
05/07/1997Submission
04/28/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/28/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
04/21/1997Motion Filed
03/27/1997Submission
03/14/1997Brief Filed
03/14/1997Case ready to be set
02/10/1997Brief Filed
02/07/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/13/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/13/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/12/1996No Description Available.
10/28/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/25/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lockett, Anthony TroyCriminal - AppellantDonald S. Gandy
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
0598283R
Ct1: Murder