Case Information: 48849 | |||
Short Caption: | HINTON (JONATHON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C218928 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/24/2007 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/01/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-02657 | |
02/14/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-03638 | |
02/14/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/15/06, 04/04/06, 10/10/06, 10/13/06, 10/16/06, 10/17/06, 12/14/06, and 12/28/06. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Thelma Stapley. | 07-03639 | |
02/26/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 2/15/07. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | 07-04634 | |
03/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-05393 | |
03/22/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/4/06; 10/10/06; 1013/06; 10/16/06; 10/17/06; 12/14/06; and 12/28/96. Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. | 07-06566 | |
04/10/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed March 7, 2007. Fn1 [We note that all the requested transcripts were filed on February 26, 2007, and March 22, 2007.] | 07-07958 | |
06/01/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 2, 2007. | 07-12046 | |
07/02/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-14423 | |
07/02/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 07-14424 | |
07/26/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-16416 | |
09/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
09/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 07-20966 | |
09/24/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 07-24455 | |
12/04/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26054 | |
12/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/19/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2007. | 07-26054 |