judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00450-CR
02-96-00450-CR
10/21/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Oldham, Mark Alan aka: Mark A. Oldham
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1998Mandate Issued
12/18/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
10/13/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
09/11/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/20/1997Submitted
05/20/1997Submission
02/19/1997Submission
02/12/1997Brief Filed
02/12/1997Case ready to be set
12/23/1996Brief Filed
10/21/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
10/17/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Oldham, mark Alan Aka: Mark A.Criminal - AppellantMichael Logan Ware
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert K. Gill
0587237D
CT1: 40 yrs IDTDCJ