judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PLUMB (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38193
Short Caption:PLUMB (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35544 , 38429
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162801Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12252
08/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant's notice of appeal is premature, and we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to file a timely appeal from a final, written order of the district court denying his motion. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-14715
09/25/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14783
09/25/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/12/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2001. 01-14783