judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT CLAYTON RONSHAUGEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0209)
Case Number:S-07-0209Case Docketed On:09/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:SCOTT CLAYTON RONSHAUGEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SCOTT CLAYTON RONSHAUGEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott Clayton RonshaugenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/25/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/26/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/09/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/10/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal