Case: 02-93-00326-CR
02-93-00326-CR
07/23/1993
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Alexander, William Patrick
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/20/1995 | Other Document Received | | |
06/30/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/10/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | Refused | |
03/23/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
02/22/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/04/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/04/1995 | Submission | | |
12/28/1994 | Letter | | |
12/22/1994 | Order Entered | | |
12/20/1994 | Letter | | |
04/13/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/13/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/15/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/14/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
02/15/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
02/09/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/07/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/21/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/20/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
12/30/1993 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/30/1993 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/18/1993 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/18/1993 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/08/1993 | Submission | | |
11/03/1993 | No Description Available. | | |
11/01/1993 | No Description Available. | | |
07/23/1993 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/23/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/30/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Alexander, William Patrick | Criminal - Appellant | Allan K. Butcher |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Betty Marshall |
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Calvin Ashley
0466689D
LIFE, IDTDCJ