Case: 04-21-00145-CV
04-21-00145-CV
04/15/2021
Miscellaneous/other civil
Arthur Bouier
Jeff 1 LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/23/2021 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/21/2021 | Order entered |
| |||||||
04/21/2021 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
04/20/2021 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | | |||||||
04/20/2021 | Order entered |
| |||||||
04/16/2021 | Internal memo | | |||||||
04/16/2021 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/15/2021 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/15/2021 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||||
04/15/2021 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||||
04/15/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/15/2021 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
01/28/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/04/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/15/2021 | Status | Pending action of court |
04/26/2021 | Status | Docketing statement due |
04/26/2021 | Status | Holding |
05/03/2021 | Status | Response due |
05/03/2021 | Status | Response due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bouier, Arthur | Appellant | Courtney D. Hilliard |
Jeff 1 LLC | Appellee | Erica A. Dryden |
Trial Court Information
408th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Laura Salinas
2020-CI-00448