judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00480-CR
02-96-00480-CR
10/21/1996
Other Felony
Nash, Jr., Ravon Donnel
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
10/21/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/08/1998Mandate Issued
09/30/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/30/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
07/27/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/08/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
03/11/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/05/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/04/1998Submitted
02/04/1998Submission
07/02/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/1997Brief Filed
06/04/1997Brief Filed
06/04/1997Motion Filed
04/23/1997Other Document Filed
04/04/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Motion Filed
12/16/1996Case ready to be set
12/03/1996Case ready to be set
12/03/1996Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/03/1996Submission
11/15/1996Motion Filed
11/07/1996Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/21/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
09/09/1996No Description Available.
08/08/1996Order Entered
07/09/1996No Description Available.
06/27/1996Appellant's brief due
06/27/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
06/13/1996No Description Available.
05/09/1996No Description Available.
04/29/1996No Description Available.
12/07/1995Appellant's brief due
10/26/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1995Appellant's brief due
10/19/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/21/1995Appellant's brief due
09/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/07/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1995No Description Available.
08/21/1995Appellant's brief due
08/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/21/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/27/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/25/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/20/1995No Description Available.
07/19/1995Appellant's brief due
06/20/1995No Description Available.
06/19/1995No Description Available.
05/22/1995No Description Available.
04/27/1995No Description Available.Item is Moot
04/21/1995No Description Available.
04/13/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/30/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/24/1995No Description Available.
03/23/1995No Description Available.
03/20/1995Record due
03/09/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
01/24/1995No Description Available.
01/10/1995No Description Available.
01/10/1995Record due
12/16/1994No Description Available.
11/10/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1994Order Entered
09/28/1994Motion Filed
09/14/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.
07/11/1994No Description Available.
05/12/1994No Description Available.
05/12/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/08/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nash, Jr., Ravon DonnelCriminal - AppellantJ. C. Carroll
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasWilliam J. Delmore, Iii
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable George Allen Crowley
94-09005
10 yrs. TDC & $10,000 fine