judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-262
B-262
05/08/1967
Application for Writ of Error
ST. LOUIS SOUTHWESTERN RAILWAY COMPANY
OWEN J. DUKE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/01/1967Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/17/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/08/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1967Opinion issued
11/01/1967Brief on the Merits
07/26/1967Document received (See Remarks)
05/17/1967Response to Petition
05/08/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Owen J. Duke, et al.Respondent
St. Louis Southwestern Railway CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information