judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-238
B-238
04/26/1967
Application for Writ of Error
GIBRALTAR SAVINGS ASSOCIATION
HOUSTON FIRST SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, ET AL., JAMES O. GERST, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/15/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/11/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/26/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1967Opinion issued
06/02/1967Reply to Response
05/15/1967Response to Petition
05/11/1967Response to Petition
05/01/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
04/26/1967Conditional application for writ of error filedDismissed
04/26/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/26/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James O. Gerst, Savings and Loan Commissioner of TexasRespondent
Houston First Savings Association, et al.Respondent
Gibraltar Savings AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information