Case: 05-19-01563-CR
05-19-01563-CR
12/19/2019
Assault
Donnie Ray Jones
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/21/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
| ||
04/16/2020 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | | ||
01/31/2020 | Brief was not filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2021 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/08/2021 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
03/08/2021 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||||
02/17/2021 | Submitted | | |||||||
01/05/2021 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
05/21/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
05/21/2020 | State brief due | | |||||||
05/08/2020 | Response due | | |||||||
04/28/2020 | Response due | | |||||||
04/22/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
04/21/2020 | Order entered | Reinstate Appeal |
| ||||||
04/21/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
04/21/2020 | Case reinstated | | |||||||
04/16/2020 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
04/16/2020 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||||
04/15/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
04/13/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
03/23/2020 | Hearing record due | | |||||||
03/03/2020 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||||
02/21/2020 | Record due | | |||||||
01/31/2020 | Brief was not filed |
| |||||||
01/29/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
01/15/2020 | Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
12/30/2019 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
12/23/2019 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
12/19/2019 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||||
12/19/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
11/13/2019 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
10/28/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/24/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/08/2046 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
05/19/2021 | Status | Mandate to Issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John Creuzot |
Jones, Donnie Ray | Criminal - Appellant | Jeff P. Buchwald Donnie Ray Jones |
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Brandon Birmingham
F-1757638-V
Peri Wood
10 YEARS TDCJ