judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-256
B-256
05/05/1967
Application for Writ of Error
RESERVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
ESTATE OF WILLIAM E. SHACKLETT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1967Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/21/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/24/1967Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/18/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/05/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/19/1967Letter Filed
06/26/1967Response to Motion filed
06/22/1967Brief in Support of Petition
06/21/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/24/1967Supplemental Brief filed
05/18/1967Response to Petition
05/05/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/05/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reserve Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Estate of William E. Shacklett, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information