judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-220
B-220
04/17/1967
Application for Writ of Error
J.A. ROBINSON SONS, INC.
BOWDEN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., MARY FRANCIS ELLIS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/25/1967Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
09/01/1967Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/18/1967Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/02/1967Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/31/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/29/1967Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/01/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/17/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/20/1967Letter Filed
09/25/1967Brief in Support of Petition
09/01/1967Brief in Support of Petition
08/18/1967Brief in Support of Petition
08/02/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/31/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1967Supplemental Brief filed
05/01/1967Response to Petition
05/01/1967Response to Petition
05/01/1967Response to Petition
04/17/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/17/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/17/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J.A. Robinson Sons, Inc.Petitioner
Mary Francis Ellis, et al.Respondent
Bowden Construction Company, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information