Case: 14-93-01103-CR
14-93-01103-CR
12/09/1993
Capital Murder
Laird, Harold Martin
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/29/1997 | Case stored | | |
05/19/1997 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
05/19/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/19/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/02/1997 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
12/09/1996 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
12/02/1996 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
11/14/1996 | Extend time to file PDR DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
11/11/1996 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
11/05/1996 | Extend time to file PDR FILED | | |
10/25/1996 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
10/25/1996 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
10/10/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
10/10/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
01/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
01/25/1996 | Submission | | |
01/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
12/13/1995 | Submission | | |
09/22/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/22/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/22/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/22/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/14/1994 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |
09/14/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/11/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/02/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/05/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/23/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
06/17/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/12/1994 | Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | GRANTED | |
05/12/1994 | No description available. | | |
05/06/1994 | Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE | | |
05/04/1994 | Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | | |
04/28/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
04/19/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/19/1994 | Past due brief | | |
03/17/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
03/17/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
03/14/1994 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
03/11/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
03/08/1994 | No description available. | | |
02/04/1994 | Transcript FILED | | |
02/03/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
01/28/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
12/09/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/08/1993 | Date of Sentence | | |
12/08/1993 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2023 | Case Stored | Case archived |
05/19/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Robert A. Morrow |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Rikke Burke Graber |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
631943
Life TDC