judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF FORT WORTH, ET AL. v. A. C. HOWERTON, ET AL.

Case: A-2861
A-2861
08/15/1950
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF FORT WORTH, ET AL.
A. C. HOWERTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/20/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/13/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/12/1950Brief on the Merits
12/09/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/18/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
09/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/24/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
08/15/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/21/1951Response to Motion filed
02/15/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/31/1951Opinion issued
12/20/1950Response to Brief filed
12/13/1950Response to Brief filed
12/12/1950Brief on the Merits
12/12/1950Letter Filed
12/09/1950Brief on the Merits
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
09/18/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
09/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/24/1950Response to Petition
08/15/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Fort Worth, et al.Petitioner
A. C. Howerton, et al.Respondent
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and Bates, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information