judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PANOS CANADIAN INVESTMENTS VS. AUSTIN

Case Information: 33372
Short Caption:PANOS CANADIAN INVESTMENTS VS. AUSTINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9702851Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/25/1998 / Berry, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/19/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Debra Robinson Naquin--check no. 1369.
11/19/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00123
11/25/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/08/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00293
12/17/1998MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 98-00405
12/18/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Temporarily stay enforcement of the district court orders of October 20, 1998, and November 17, 1998, until further order of this court. Respondent's response due 1/4/99. District court order due in this court 5 days after the date it was entered in the district court. 98-00444
01/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Submission of Trial Court's Order. 99-00023
01/07/1999MotionFiled Motion. Request for Submission of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal for Decision. 99-00080
03/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On Decemer 18, 1998, we temporarily stayed enforcement of the district court's orders of October 20, 1998, and November 17, 1998, until we received and considered respondents' opposition for a stay. Respondents have not filed an opposition to date, and we therefore grant appellants' motion for a stay. The challenged district court orders shall not be enforced during the pendency of this appeal or until further order of this court. 99-01663
04/14/1999MotionFiled Motion. Petition for Order of Limited Remand. 99-02880
04/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Petition for Order of Limited Remand. 99-03077
05/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to modify and clarify its order with respect to the 1996 payment under the Placer Dome contract, and the distribution thereof, consistent with its findings of fact, conclusions of law, and judgment. The district court shallenter its order within 30 days of the date of this order, and shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to this court. fn1[This order of limited remand does not affect the viability of this appeal or the continuing jurisdiction of this court]. 99-03814
06/11/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-04980
06/11/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-04981
06/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-05278
06/18/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.