judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELIZAVETA MIKELADZE V. MALKHAZ MIKELADZE

Case Information: 10-FM-1100
Short Caption:ELIZAVETA MIKELADZE V. MALKHAZ MIKELADZEClassification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB1346-10Filed Date:09/01/2010

Opening Event Date:09/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/17/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElizaveta Mikeladze N
Krista E. Bianco NN
AppelleeMalkhaz Mikeladze N
Joel W. Anders NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY of trial court's order dismissing complaint and counterclaim and trial court's order denying Petition for Writ of Ne Exeat Republica and for a preliminary injunction prohibiting removal of a minor child from the court's jurisdiction pending appeal
09/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL ******TO THE EXTENT...SEE 9/9/10 ORDER LW
09/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 - (8/30/10 - 47pp - TAPE)
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 - (8/31/10 - 12pp - TAPE)
09/07/2010RECEIVED-aplt's certificate of service for aplt's motion to stay, for a prelimnary injunction prohibiting removal of a minor child from the court's jurisdiction pending appeal and aplts' motion to expedite appeal
09/08/2010RECEIVED - copy of order from superior court
09/08/2010TMC - appellant's motion to EXPEDITE - appellant's motion to STAY TRIAL COURT ORDER - appellant's motion for preliminary injunction
09/09/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO EXPEDITE IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that consideration of appellant's motions are expedited. It is *****MORE*****
09/09/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR STAY of the trial court's AUGUST 31, 2010 ORDER IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S REQUEST for an order directing appellee to continue to pay $800 per month pending appeal IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
09/09/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (FITHNW) (rl)
09/10/2010RECORD INDEX
09/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
10/26/2010ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
10/26/2010DISMISSED
11/17/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived